Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Stumpf-Skrhak, Mary Ellen, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Pennington, James E, against Moore, William Thomas Md, represented by Thornton, Russell G, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with PATTERSON, JAY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePATTERSON, JAY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2002 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2003 | Docket Event | ADMIN FEE/CN | |
July 08, 2003 | Docket Event | JIM HAMLIN | |
June 27, 2003 | Docket Event | SENT TO RECORDS | |
June 26, 2003 | Docket Event | O/DISMISS | |
June 25, 2003 | Docket Event | TRUST-CLE/W 00001000 | |
June 25, 2003 | Docket Event | ORD SENT TO COURT | |
June 25, 2003 | Docket Event | TRUST-STU/W 00019000 | |
June 24, 2003 | Docket Event | WALKED TO TRUST | |
June 20, 2003 | Docket Event | O/RET CASH BOND | |
May 29, 2003 | Docket Event | M/REQ RET CASH BOND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.