Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Flagship Credit Corpo, Wells Fargo Financial Fka, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Houghton, Carole, against Bailey, Gevala, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with PATTERSON, JAY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePATTERSON, JAY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2002 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2003 | Docket Event | SENT TO RECORDS | |
March 04, 2003 | Docket Event | ****** 30 DAY ****** | |
February 28, 2003 | Docket Event | O/DFLT JUDGMT | |
February 19, 2003 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
February 19, 2003 | Docket Event | CERT OF ATTY | |
February 18, 2003 | Docket Event | CERT OF ATTY | |
February 18, 2003 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
January 16, 2003 | Docket Event | RET CIT PPS | |
December 31, 2002 | Docket Event | SANDERS BAKER | |
December 31, 2002 | Docket Event | CIT & COP MAIL ATTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.