Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Copeland, Bobbie, Copeland, Lehman, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Jones, Ralph Cole, against Paten, Punit, Amr Corp. Dba, Prospect Airport Services, represented by Martin, John H, Richardson, Michael D, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with JUDICIAL, OFFICER DC presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDICIAL, OFFICER DC Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2002 |
CategoryDamages |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT Termination of Qualified Settlement Fund (Motion & Order) IN CAMERA |
|
November 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT JACKET TO TRUST |
|
October 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
MOTION HEARING Sign O-Disburse Funds (set by Mr. Jones) Documents under seal by Order of the Court |
|
October 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT 5TH M/PARTIAL ALLOCATION SETTELMNT |
|
October 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER - MISC. O-5TH PARTIAL ALLOCATION OF SETTLEMENT |
|
August 18, 2005 | Docket Event | JACKET TO RECORDS | |
March 30, 2005 | Docket Event | 4TH O/PARTIAL PAYMT | |
March 24, 2005 | Docket Event | CERT/CONF | |
March 24, 2005 | Docket Event | 4TH M/PART STLMNT | |
January 27, 2005 | Docket Event | JKT#3 TO RECORDS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.