Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Morale, Claudine S, Morale, David, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Porter, Brent Md, East Lake Primary Car, Medical Edge Healthcare, Kurtz, Richard Md, represented by Nelson, Susan I, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with ASHBY, ANNE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeASHBY, ANNE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2002 |
CategoryDamages |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2003 | Docket Event | SENT TO RECORDS | |
October 10, 2003 | Docket Event | SENT TO RECORDS | |
September 30, 2003 | Docket Event | O/NONSUIT | |
September 25, 2003 | Docket Event | AJ DEC-D/M/DISMISS | |
September 19, 2003 | Docket Event | M/NONSUIT | |
August 26, 2003 | Docket Event | M/DISMISS | |
August 06, 2003 | Docket Event | O/WD ATTY | |
August 05, 2003 | Docket Event | SUPP M/WD CNSL | |
July 30, 2003 | Docket Event | M/WD CNSL | |
July 21, 2003 | Docket Event | O/PARTIAL NONSUIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.