Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Johnson, Larry, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cheatum, Wynthia J, against Fleming, Charles, Dart Bus Operator # 2, Hutchings, Shelley, Dallas Area Rapid Transit, represented by Simmons, Hyattye O, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 191st District Court with HAYNES, CATHARINA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHAYNES, CATHARINA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2002 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House191st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2004 | Docket Event | SENT 1JKT TO RECORDS | |
June 30, 2004 | Docket Event | O/D W P | |
May 21, 2004 | Docket Event | O/NON SUIT | |
May 18, 2004 | Docket Event | M/NON SUIT | |
April 08, 2004 | Docket Event | SUBP & COP ATTY | |
April 08, 2004 | Docket Event | TD EXPRESS COURIERS | |
March 12, 2004 | Docket Event | N/FILE PUBLIC RECORD | |
February 03, 2004 | Docket Event | M/CONTINUE | |
December 31, 2003 | Docket Event | O/CONTINUE | |
December 17, 2003 | Docket Event | M/CONTINUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.