Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Albritton, Janice D, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Lowenstein, Jeffrey, against Lemasters, William F Jr, represented by Hight, Brenda Neel, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with KELTON, DAVID presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKELTON, DAVID Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2002 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2005 | Docket Event | **SNT JKT #5 REC'S** | |
May 20, 2004 | Docket Event | **SENT 5 JKT REC'S** | |
May 17, 2004 | Docket Event | N/NONSUIT | |
March 17, 2004 | Docket Event | M/LEAVE | |
March 17, 2004 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT | |
March 17, 2004 | Docket Event | M/CONTINUE | |
March 12, 2004 | Docket Event | OBJ/D/APPEAL AJ DEC | |
March 12, 2004 | Docket Event | SUPL M/EXCLUDE | |
March 12, 2004 | Docket Event | M/EXCL EXPT TESTIMON | |
March 09, 2004 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.