Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vaughn, Tony, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Shoecraft, James Warren, against Harry'S Transportation Se, Dodd, Michael Victor, Dodd, Harry A H Jr, represented by Mullen, Michael S, Ledyard, John M, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with STOKES, CHARLES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTOKES, CHARLES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2002 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2004 | Docket Event | RET/RECORDS | |
September 23, 2004 | Docket Event | JKT SENT TO RECORDS | |
September 22, 2004 | Docket Event | O/DISMISS | |
September 22, 2004 | Docket Event | M/DISMISSAL | |
May 13, 2004 | Docket Event | CERT DEPO/VAUGHAN TO | |
April 26, 2004 | Docket Event | N/CHG/ATTY | |
October 15, 2003 | Docket Event | O/SCHEDULING | |
August 18, 2003 | Docket Event | ATTY-MULLEN MICHAEL | |
August 18, 2003 | Docket Event | ORIG ANS-HARRY'S TR | |
August 18, 2003 | Docket Event | ORIG ANS-HARRY A.H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.