Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Inc. #6016, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Andrew Albright, against Comal Appraisal District, represented by Ryan Lucas James, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Waldrip, Dib presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWaldrip, Dib Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT OF COURT ORDER | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT (Judicial Officer: Waldrip, Dib ) | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | RULE 11 | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF COUNSEL | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION RETURNED SERVED | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Comal Appraisal District Served 09/02/2021 Response Due 09/27/2021 | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.