Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ramos, Marina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Scott Braden, against Corley, Tyler, Diamondback Mechanical Group: Air Conditioning, Heating & Refrigeration, Llc, Stanush, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Wright-Reneau, Tracie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWright-Reneau, Tracie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT (Judicial Officer: Wright-Reneau, Tracie ) | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT OF COURT ORDER | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-SUIT | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ***NOTE*** | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PROCESS | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.