Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) Suits On Debt case represented by Thomas Sellers, against Rodriguez, Matthew, represented by Barry L. Efron, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Bascon, Stephanie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBascon, Stephanie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategorySuits On Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeSummary Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF DELIVERY | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT OF COURT ORDER | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | ###### JUDGE'S DOCKET SHEET/NOTES ##### | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion For Summary Judgment (9:00 AM) () Result: Motion Granted | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Judicial Officer: Bascon, Stephanie ) | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion For Summary Judgment Other CANCELED Motion For Summary Judgment (9:00 AM) () Other |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.