Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) Suits On Debt case represented by Alejandra Conoley, against Carter, Monica, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Boyer, R. Bruce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBoyer, R. Bruce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2021 |
CategorySuits On Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT OF COURT ORDER | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NONSUIT (Judicial Officer: Boyer, R. Bruce ) | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-SUIT | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Carter, Monica Unserved | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ***NOTE*** | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PROCESS | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.