Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Koch, Connie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by James S. Bettersworth, against Mcbride, Carl, Odell Anderson D B A Od Anderson, represented by Marsheldondria Johnson, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:01 AM) () | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Re-Set CANCELED Jury Trial (9:01 AM) () Re-Set |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Judicial Officer: Waldrip, Dib ) | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (Judicial Officer: Waldrip, Dib ) | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.