Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Suits On Debt case represented by Talisa Karene Lowery, against Solis, Juan, represented by Daniel M. Schafer, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Stephens, Charles A., II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephens, Charles A., II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2021 |
CategorySuits On Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Non Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT OF COURT ORDER | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NONSUIT (Judicial Officer: Stephens, Charles A., II ) | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NONSUIT (Judicial Officer: Boyer, R. Bruce ) | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-SUIT | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT OF COURT ORDER | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT (Judicial Officer: Waldrip, Dib ) | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ANSWER | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION RETURNED SERVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.