Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Community Association Of Mockingbird Heights, Inc., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Alex Valdes, against Powers, Andrea, Powers, Heath A., in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT OF COURT ORDER | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-SUIT | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION RETURNED SERVED | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Powers, Heath A. Served 06/10/2021 Response Due 07/05/2021 Powers, Andrea Served 06/10/2021 Response Due 07/05/2021 | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PROCESS | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.