Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
J. G. Wentworth Origiantions, Llc, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Julie Pi Evans, against Redacted, Name, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Bascon, Stephanie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBascon, Stephanie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO UNSEAL (Judicial Officer: Bascon, Stephanie ) | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO UNSEAL | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO UNSEAL | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ###### JUDGE'S DOCKET SHEET/NOTES ##### | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT OF COURT ORDER | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights (9:00 AM) () Result: Granted | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.