Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Briar Meadows Property Owners Association, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael B Thurman, against Milks, Amber Nicole, Occupant, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF DELIVERY | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Judicial Officer: Bascon, Stephanie ) | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT OF COURT ORDER | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ###### JUDGE'S DOCKET SHEET/NOTES ##### | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Default Judgment (9:00 AM) () Result: Granted | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.