Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jennings, Audra M, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by D Kimberli Wallace, against Fay Servicing, Llc, U.S. Bank Trust Na As Trustee For Lsf9 Master Participation Trust, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Andrea K. Bouressa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrea K. Bouressa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeOrder On Nonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Release Cash Bond Order for Return of Bond Order for Return of Bond Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Order Order on Nonsuit Order on Nonsuit Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Notice Amended Notice of Nonsuit Amended Notice of Nonsuit Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Release Cash Bond Unopposed Motion for Return of Bond Unopposed Motion for Return of Bond Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Injunction Per Attorney CANCELED Temporary Injunction (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Bouressa, Andrea) Per Attorney 09/16/2021 Reset by Court to 09/29/2021 Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Injunction (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Bouressa, Andrea) | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Continuance Order Continuing Temporary Injunction Hearing and Granting Extension of Temporary Restraining Order Order Continuing Temporary Injunction Hearing and Granting Extension of Temporary Restraining Order Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bond Application Fee Collected $5.00
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Cash Deposit in Lieu of Surety Bond
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Fay Servicing, LLC Unserved U.S. Bank Trust NA as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust Unserved
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.