Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brown, Amber As Next Friend Of P.B. A Minor, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by John C. Ginn, against Allstate Mutual Insurance Company, Owusu, Dylan, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co., Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Michelanie E. Rayford, Suzanne C Ekvall, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Bouressa, Andrea presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBouressa, Andrea Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Order Judgment Letter Emailed to John C. Ginn and Suzanne C Ekvall Judgment Letter Emailed to John C. Ginn and Suzanne C Ekvall Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Order Order of Non-Suit on Allstate County Mutual Ins. Co. Order of Non-Suit on Allstate County Mutual Ins. Co. Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Notice Notice of Nonsuit Notice of Nonsuit Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Order to Dismiss CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bouressa, Andrea) Order to Dismiss Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Order to Dismiss CANCELED Pre Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bouressa, Andrea) Order to Dismiss Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition (Bill of Cost Form) Reporter's Certification Remote Deposition of P.B. August 9, 2022 Volume 2 Certificate of Deposition (Bill of Cost Form) Reporter's Certification Remote Deposition of P.B. August 9, 2022 Volume 2 Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition (Bill of Cost Form) Deposition by Written Questions-Custodian of Claims/Insurance Records for: Geico Certificate of Deposition (Bill of Cost Form) Deposition by Written Questions-Custodian of Claims/Insurance Records for: Geico Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mediation Action Settled Settled Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Objection Defendant Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company's Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's 18.001 Affidavits Defendant Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company's Objections and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's 18.001 Affidavits Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition (Bill of Cost Form) Deposition by Written Questions Propounded to the Witness: Custodian of Claims / Insurance: Records for: Geico Claim No. 0136370840000006 Certificate of Deposition (Bill of Cost Form) Deposition by Written Questions Propounded to the Witness: Custodian of Claims / Insurance: Records for: Geico Claim No. 0136370840000006 Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.