Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Vasquez, Freddy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by David Sheves, against Rocha, Gloria, Rocha, Leonardo Daniel, represented by Janet K. Colaneri, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Andrea K. Bouressa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrea K. Bouressa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Order Order to Dismiss Order to Dismiss Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mailed Judgment Letters Judgment Letters Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Per Attorney CANCELED Motion for Summary Judgment (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bouressa, Andrea) Per Attorney by video- Def's MSJ Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter to David Sheves re: Hearing Canceled Letter Letter to David Sheves re: Hearing Canceled Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Defendant Gloria Rocha's Motion for Summary Judgment Defendant Gloria Rocha's Motion for Summary Judgment Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter to Opposing Counsel Letter Letter to Opposing Counsel Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Re: Letter Serving Discovery on Plaintiff Re: Letter Serving Discovery on Plaintiff Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.