Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sierra, Stacey B, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Griffin, Elgia Jerome, Ii, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Tucker, Angela presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTucker, Angela Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2013 |
CategoryFamily Transfer In From Another County |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Nonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable DWOP Letter DWOP Letter Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
AG Return of Service (OAG Use Only) Elgia Jerome Griffin II (Recalled) Elgia Jerome Griffin II (Recalled) Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable DWOP Letter DWOP Letter Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
AG Order (OAG Use Only) Order to Withdraw Capias (Eligia Jerome Griffin II) Order to Withdraw Capias (Eligia Jerome Griffin II) Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
AG Motion - Comment (OAG Use Only) Motion to Withdraw Capias Motion to Withdraw Capias Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
AG Case Information - Cover Sheet (OAG Use Only)
Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
May 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Warrant Recalled Griffin, Elgia Jerome, II Returned Unserved 10/31/2016 Returned 10/31/2016 Recalled Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Administrative Order Case transferred to the 469th Judicial Court, per Administrative Order Signed August 24, 2015, to be effective as of September 1, 2015. Case transferred to the 469th Judicial Court, per Administrative Order Signed August 24, 2015, to be effective as of September 1, 2015. Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Per Attorney CANCELED Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Tucker, Angela) Per Attorney Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
AG Appearance (OAG Use Only) 5-29-2014
Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.