Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bermea, Monissa Deanna, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Toler, Nicholas Don, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryFamily Transfer In From Another County |
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders and Motion to Transfer and Order to Appear (11/13/2020) Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders and Motion to Transfer and Order to Appear (11/13/2020) |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance (12/10/2020) | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Establishing the Parent-Child Relationship (12/03/2008) Order Order Establishing the Parent-Child Relationship (12/03/2008) |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Clerk's Certification Letter Clerk's Certification Letter |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mailed Transfer In Letter Transfer In Letter |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement for Temporary Orders (12/16/2020) Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 Agreement for Temporary Orders (12/16/2020) |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Transfer In Transfer Letter Transfer Letter |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Transfer (11/06/2020) Motion Motion to Transfer (11/06/2020) |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order on Motion to Transfer (01/06/2021) Agreed Order Agreed Order on Motion to Transfer (01/06/2021) |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order - Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support Amended IWO (02/10/2011) Amended IWO (02/10/2011) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.