Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hernandez, Maria Laura filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Hernandez, Aristides Emilio, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Willis, Jill presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWillis, Jill Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2019 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certified Green Card Returned Jan Holewell-Smith Jan Holewell-Smith Judge: Willis, Jill Party(Hernandez, Maria Laura;Â Hernandez, Aristides EmilioAgreed Order Vacating Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status Review Other CANCELED Status Review (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Willis, Jill) Other Judge: Willis, Jill Party(Hernandez, Maria Laura;Â Hernandez, Aristides EmilioAgreed Order Vacating Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mailed Order sent to Applicant and Respondent Attorney Certified Mail Order sent to Applicant and Respondent Attorney Certified Mail Judge: Willis, Jill Party(Hernandez, Maria Laura;Â Hernandez, Aristides EmilioAgreed Order Vacating Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mailed Applicants Employer and Rachel Harrington Elementary Applicants Employer and Rachel Harrington Elementary Judge: Willis, Jill Party(Hernandez, Maria Laura;Â Hernandez, Aristides EmilioAgreed Order Vacating Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Subpoena $8.00
Judge: Willis, Jill Party(Hernandez, Maria Laura;Â Hernandez, Aristides EmilioAgreed Order Vacating Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Plano Police Department Unserved
Judge: Willis, Jill Party(Hernandez, Maria Laura;Â Hernandez, Aristides EmilioAgreed Order Vacating Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Ann Marie Roberts, Ph.D Unserved
Judge: Willis, Jill Party(Hernandez, Maria Laura;Â Hernandez, Aristides EmilioAgreed Order Vacating Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response Reply to Respondent's Motion to Vacate Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order Reply to Respondent's Motion to Vacate Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order Judge: Willis, Jill Party(Hernandez, Maria Laura;Â Hernandez, Aristides EmilioAgreed Order Vacating Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Temporary Ex Parte Protectective Order Motion Motion to Vacate Temporary Ex Parte Protectective Order Judge: Willis, Jill Party(Hernandez, Maria Laura;Â Hernandez, Aristides EmilioAgreed Order Vacating Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry Petitioner appeared pro se; Respondent appeared w/ counsel. Agreement reached as to PO and Temporary Orders for divorce case 429-55593-2018 and entered as Judge's Memorandum into divorce case. Temporary ex-parte PO extended until report back hearing on February 20 @ 9:00 a.m. Petitioner appeared pro se; Respondent appeared w/ counsel. Agreement reached as to PO and Temporary Orders for divorce case 429-55593-2018 and entered as Judge's Memorandum into divorce case. Temporary ex-parte PO extended until report back hearing on February 20 @ 9:00 a.m. Judge: Willis, Jill Party(Hernandez, Maria Laura;Â Hernandez, Aristides EmilioAgreed Order Vacating Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.