Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Wheless, Cynthia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWheless, Cynthia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2018 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mailed DWOP DWOP Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M Party(Smith, Levery;Â Smith, Corey Leon |
|
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wheless, Cynthia M) Result: Dismissed
Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M Party(Smith, Levery;Â Smith, Corey Leon |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Admin - Mailed Notice DWOP DWOP Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M Party(Smith, Levery;Â Smith, Corey Leon |
|
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Protective Order Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Wheless, Cynthia M) 01/15/2019 Reset by Court to 01/29/2019 01/29/2019 Reset by Court to 02/12/2019 Result: No Action Taken
Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M Party(Smith, Levery;Â Smith, Corey Leon |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Constable Service Return Temporary Ex Parte PO - Corey Leon Smith - Unserved Temporary Ex Parte PO - Corey Leon Smith - Unserved Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M Party(Smith, Levery;Â Smith, Corey Leon |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Issued Protective Order (Court Activity)
Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M Party(Smith, Levery;Â Smith, Corey Leon |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Order for Extension of Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order Order for Extension of Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M Party(Smith, Levery;Â Smith, Corey Leon |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Ex Parte Protective Order $8.00
Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M Party(Smith, Levery;Â Smith, Corey Leon |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Constable Service Fee #1, $175.00 Constable Service Fee #1, $175.00 Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M Party(Smith, Levery;Â Smith, Corey Leon |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Protective Order Smith, Corey Leon Returned Unserved 02/11/2019 Returned 02/11/2019
Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M Party(Smith, Levery;Â Smith, Corey Leon |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.