Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Wheless, Cynthia M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWheless, Cynthia M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2020 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeOrder On Motion To Modify |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion - Modify Other - SAPCR Reopen $30.00 Agreed Motion to Motion Modify Agreed Mutual Injuction Agreed Motion to Motion Modify Agreed Mutual Injuction Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Constable Service Return Officer's Return- Unserved Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order- Officer's Return- Unserved Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order- Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Green Card Service Return by Certified Mail Dallas County Sheriff's Office Dallas County Sheriff's Office Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing Transferred To Another Court CANCELED Protective Order Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Willis, Jill) Transferred To Another Court Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing Agreement Reached CANCELED Protective Order Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Wheless, Cynthia M) Agreement Reached Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Counter Petition $65.00 Counter- Application for Protective Order and In the Alternative Permanent Injunction Counter- Application for Protective Order and In the Alternative Permanent Injunction Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended TCIC Protective Order Data Entry Form Amended Amended TCIC Protective Order Data Entry Form Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Ex Parte Protective Order $8.00
Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Protective Order Barone, Roger Richard Returned Unserved 05/15/2020 Returned 05/15/2020
Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Issued Protective Order (Court Activity)
Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.