Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Final Decree Of Divorce filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with ZZ DO NOT USE Oldner, Chris presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZZ DO NOT USE Oldner, Chris Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2009 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Mailed corrected certified decrees to both parties corrected certified decrees to both parties Judge: ZZ DO NOT USE Oldner, Chris |
|
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Divorce Prove Up - Docket Entry Divorce Granted Divorce Granted Judge: ZZ DO NOT USE Oldner, Chris |
|
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Certified Documents Paid - $5 per document Certified Documents Paid - $5 per document Judge: ZZ DO NOT USE Oldner, Chris |
|
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Granted
Judge: ZZ DO NOT USE Oldner, Chris |
|
December 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw
Judge: ZZ DO NOT USE Oldner, Chris |
|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Citation $8.00 Qty. 1 constable # 3 Qty. 1 constable # 3 Judge: ZZ DO NOT USE Oldner, Chris |
|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Citation Hernandez, Guadalupe Served 11/19/2009 Returned 11/23/2009
Judge: ZZ DO NOT USE Oldner, Chris |
|
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Practical Parenting Education Certificate
Judge: ZZ DO NOT USE Oldner, Chris |
|
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Requiring Completiton of For Kid's Sake Seminar
Judge: ZZ DO NOT USE Oldner, Chris |
|
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Letter Cover Cover Judge: ZZ DO NOT USE Oldner, Chris |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.