Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Maglisceau, Jamie I, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Maglisceau, Tiffany W, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryAll Other Family Matters |
Last RefreshedJune 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Certified Copy Verification (Electronic) Certified Copy Verification (Electronic) |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Respondent's Original Answer to Motion for Enforcement 05/14/2021 Respondent's Original Answer to Motion for Enforcement 05/14/2021 |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Service Return - Citation to Tiffany W. Maglisceau- 04/29/2021 Service Return - Citation to Tiffany W. Maglisceau- 04/29/2021 |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enforcement of Possession or Access 04/20/2021 Motion Motion for Enforcement of Possession or Access 04/20/2021 |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Withdrawal of Motion to Transfer 05/28/2021 Withdrawal of Motion to Transfer 05/28/2021 |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Confidentiality Order 08/10/2020 Confidentiality Order 08/10/2020 |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Notice of Appearance as Counsel and Motion to Dismiss 04/15/2021 Notice of Appearance as Counsel and Motion to Dismiss 04/15/2021 |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Order Transferring Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship 06/03/2021 Order Transferring Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship 06/03/2021 |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Transfer 04/05/2021 Motion Motion to Transfer 04/05/2021 |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Transfer In Transfer Letter Transfer Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.