Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Donald D Degrasse, Shawn R. Redman, against Shinners, Craig, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Flint, George B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFlint, George B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance of Counsel Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Counsel Judge: Flint, George B. |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter to Clerk Letter Letter to Clerk Judge: Flint, George B. |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Final Judgment CANCELED Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Flint, George B.) Final Judgment Judge: Flint, George B. |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mailed Judgment Letters Judgment Letters Judge: Flint, George B. |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment
Judge: Flint, George B. |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address
Judge: Flint, George B. |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Member & Sailor's Affidavit ServiceMembers Civil Relief Act Affidavit ServiceMembers Civil Relief Act Affidavit Judge: Flint, George B. |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Cover Letter Cover Letter Judge: Flint, George B. |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Admin - Mailed Notice
Judge: Flint, George B. |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Plaintiff's Affidavit and/or Other Trial Related Documents Notice Notice of Filing of Plaintiff's Affidavit and/or Other Trial Related Documents Judge: Flint, George B. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.