Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Frisco Independent School District Collin County Collin County Ccd, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Erin Minett Hutto, against Frisco Jdj, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Smith, Benjamin N. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, Benjamin N. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2014 |
CategoryTax Cases - District |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Smith, Benjamin N. |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Citation Frisco JDJ, LLC Served 09/03/2014
Judge: Smith, Benjamin N. |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Citation $8.00
Judge: Smith, Benjamin N. |
|
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Constable Service Fee #4, $75.00
Judge: Smith, Benjamin N. |
|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request Issuance Request Form Issuance Request Form Judge: Smith, Benjamin N. |
|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request Citation for Frisco JDJ LLC Citation for Frisco JDJ LLC Judge: Smith, Benjamin N. |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Frisco JDJ LLC Civil Case Information Sheet Frisco JDJ LLC Civil Case Information Sheet Judge: Smith, Benjamin N. |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Tax Original Petition - OCA $222.00 Plaintiffs Original Petition Plaintiffs Original Petition Judge: Smith, Benjamin N. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.