Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bankers Insurance Company filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Arce, David Williams, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Biard, Webb Party(Arce, David Williams, Jr.; Bankers Insurance Company presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBiard, Webb Party(Arce, David Williams, Jr.; Bankers Insurance Company Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 07, 2017 |
CategoryJudgment Nisi |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment Nisi - Order |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Receipt sent to DA NISI and Criminal Supervisor Receipt sent to DA NISI and Criminal Supervisor Judge: Biard, Webb Party(Arce, David Williams, Jr.; Bankers Insurance Company |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable
Judge: Biard, Webb Party(Arce, David Williams, Jr.; Bankers Insurance Company |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment NISI Interest $
Judge: Biard, Webb Party(Arce, David Williams, Jr.; Bankers Insurance Company |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Order Letter, Bill and Order to Defendant and Attorney for Bankers Letter, Bill and Order to Defendant and Attorney for Bankers Judge: Biard, Webb Party(Arce, David Williams, Jr.; Bankers Insurance Company |
|
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter Notice Letter Notice Letter Judge: Biard, Webb Party(Arce, David Williams, Jr.; Bankers Insurance Company |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer Judge: Biard, Webb Party(Arce, David Williams, Jr.; Bankers Insurance Company |
|
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable
Judge: Biard, Webb Party(Arce, David Williams, Jr.; Bankers Insurance Company |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation Arce, David Williams, Jr. Served 03/08/2017
Judge: Biard, Webb Party(Arce, David Williams, Jr.; Bankers Insurance Company |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet
Judge: Biard, Webb Party(Arce, David Williams, Jr.; Bankers Insurance Company |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment NISI (OCA) $308.00 Judgment of Forfeiture-Corporate Surety Bond Judgment of Forfeiture-Corporate Surety Bond Judge: Biard, Webb Party(Arce, David Williams, Jr.; Bankers Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.