Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Thomas Publishing Co., Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Lawrence J. Falli, against Whitmore, David, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Tucker, Angela presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTucker, Angela Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Constable Service Return
Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter Request for Writ of Execution Request for Writ of Execution Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ Whitmore, David Served 04/11/2022
Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Writ of Execution $8.00
Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Letter Mailed
Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Return Citation - David Whitmore DBA Ground Zero Supplies Citation - David Whitmore DBA Ground Zero Supplies Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Whitmore, David Served 06/10/2021 Returned 07/06/2021
Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Citation $8.00
Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $371.00
Judge: Tucker, Angela |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.