Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Surety Company filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Chico, Oscar Rolando, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Davis, Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavis, Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryJudgment Nisi |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment Nisi - Order |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Before the Court Orders Signed CANCELED Trial Before the Court (1:30 PM) () Orders Signed Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable
Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Receipt submitted to DA NISI Q and Criminal Supervisor Q Receipt submitted to DA NISI Q and Criminal Supervisor Q Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment NISI Interest $
Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bill of Cost - No Fee
Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mailed Judgment, Default Judgment and Bills of Costs Judgment, Default Judgment and Bills of Costs Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Order Document Sent to DA NISI, Criminal Supervisor and Finance Office Queues Document Sent to DA NISI, Criminal Supervisor and Finance Office Queues Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Notice Letter - TBC Hearing Notice Letter - TBC Hearing Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable
Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer and General Denial Original Answer Original Answer and General Denial Judge: Davis, Richard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.