Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Beal Properties, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Williams, Barbara Teshana, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Hill, Rick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHill, Rick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Eviction | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Eviction | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ISSUED | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.