Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tx Excel Property Management, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Foxworth, Chelsey Raget, Rogers, Christopher Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Hill, Rick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHill, Rick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Eviction | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Alternate Service | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ISSUED | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.