Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Kumar, Rahul Mahato, represented by Denuna, Chris, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Hawthorne, Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHawthorne, Kyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PLEA PAPERS/AGREEMENT | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Hearing | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Status of Attorney | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY LETTER OF REPRESENTATION | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Bond | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Warrant Served - OCA | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NISI SIGNED | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Warrant Issued-OCA | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.