Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Donaldson, Olivia Jeane, represented by Lewis, Neeley C., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Hilburn, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHilburn, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | MT FOR COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY'S FEES/APPROVAL | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Pull | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | MT FOR COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY'S FEES/APPROVAL | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Status of Attorney | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Indictment (OCA) | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Bond |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.