Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hawkins, Alicia Annette, represented by Mclain, Cailey, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Brick, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrick, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CAPIAS PRO FINE ISSUED | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Issue Capias Pro Fine | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Indigency Hearing | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Hearing | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Adjudicating Guilt | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL MISC. | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Fingerprint Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.