Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Harris, Christopher, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Willoughby, Joshua R., against Lopez Rivera, Josafat, Requena Enterprises Llc Individually And Dba Double R. Trucking Co, represented by Lapidus, Mark R., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Brick, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrick, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Pull | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AS TO RULE 306A | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | RETENTION (DESTROY DATE) | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Signed Order | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Served | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Served | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.