Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cargill, Deborah, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jones, Chad E., against Germania Select Insurance Company, represented by Dorsett, Keith, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Locke, Jim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLocke, Jim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AS TO RULE 306A | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | RETENTION (DESTROY DATE) | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Signed Order | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER FOR THE FILE | |
August 28, 2022 | Docket Event | REPORTERS CERTIFICATE | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER FOR THE FILE | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.