Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lima, Alicia, Lima, Charlie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Stark, Jonathan R., against Christ United Methodist Church - College Station D B A School For Little People, represented by Macdonald, David M., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Matzke, Amanda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatzke, Amanda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 06, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | RETENTION (DESTROY DATE) | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AS TO RULE 306A | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Signed Judgment | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | SETTING REQUESTS | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Signed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.