Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
John Deere Financial, F.S.B., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jenkins, Jody D., against Batchelor, Jason, Batchelor, Jennifer, J B Plumbing Llc, represented by Doss, Matthew David, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Hilburn, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHilburn, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AS TO RULE 306A | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | RETENTION (DESTROY DATE) | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR NONSUIT | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON NONSUIT AND DISMISSAL | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONTINUE | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | SETTING REQUESTS | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.