Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Castaneda, Olivia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Davis, William, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Bourland, Michael E., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Brick, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrick, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Hearing | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | RETENTION (DESTROY DATE) | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Signed Order | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Pull | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPO BY WRITTEN QUEST. | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.