Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Vehicle And Property Insurance Company, American Select Insurance Company, California Automobile Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, (total of 9) See All filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Groover, Zachary, against Lsp Products Group Inc, represented by Green, Adam W., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Hawthorne, Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHawthorne, Kyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AS TO RULE 306A | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETENTION (DESTROY DATE) | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NONSUIT | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | SETTING REQUESTS | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER FOR THE FILE | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Summary Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.