Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dreamspring, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stickney, Erika B., against Hassan, Muhammad, Mawbra, Inc., represented by Daic, Megan Ashley, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Hawthorne, Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHawthorne, Kyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AS TO RULE 306A | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | RETENTION (DESTROY DATE) | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Signed Judgment | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Issued | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Issue Process Instructions | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.