Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The Leasing Spot Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Still, Ian, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Nunn, Terrence presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNunn, Terrence Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT RETURNED | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Service | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of judgment to Plaintiff(s) | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Eviction | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of judgment to Defendant(s) | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION RETURNED | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.