Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The Grand 1501, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Bennett, Ty'Ana, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Nunn, Terrence presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNunn, Terrence Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of judgment to Plaintiff(s) | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy of judgment to Defendant(s) | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Eviction | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION RETURNED | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Alternate Service | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Officer's Sworn Request for Alternate Service | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ISSUED | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Forcible Detainer | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.