Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Linebaugh, Mason, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Nunn, Terrence presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNunn, Terrence Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Deferred Disposition | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Show Cause Hearing (OCA) | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Show Cause Hearing (OCA) | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Community Service | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEAD-NOLO | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | New Cases Filed (OCA) | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | DPS Citation and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.