Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Pace, Christopher Demound, represented by Davis, Kyle A., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Zachary, Dana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZachary, Dana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedJanuary 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Hearing | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | JAIL ORDER | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA PAPERS/AGREEMENT | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Fingerprint Document | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Information (OCA) | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | WARNING BY MAGISTRATE | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.