Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Connick, Gretchen O. filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Banks, Donald Charles, represented by Shimek, Bruno A., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Hawthorne, Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHawthorne, Kyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 19, 2020 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Warrant Served | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Issue Capias Pro Fine | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CAPIAS PRO FINE ISSUED | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED DISCOVERY RECEIPT REPORT | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Fingerprint Document | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | COMMITMENT/RELEASE ORDER | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA PAPERS/AGREEMENT | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.