Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Fontenot, Christopher Dewayne-Keith, represented by Maltsberger, Mark R., Martin, Marvin B., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Locke, Jim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLocke, Jim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2020 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | MT FOR COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY'S FEES/APPROVAL | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Plea Deadline | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Reset | |
February 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Status/Plea | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.