Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Alvarez, Jeremy, represented by Cagle, Corey M., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Zachary, Dana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZachary, Dana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2020 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Warrant Recalled | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO RECALL CAPIAS | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Issue Capias Pro Fine | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CAPIAS PRO FINE ISSUED | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Fingerprint Document | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA PAPERS/AGREEMENT | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | MT FOR COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY'S FEES/APPROVAL | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea Deadline | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT EXTENSION AGREEMENT | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.